Go through the **Spectrum Math Grade 6 Answer Key Chapter 1 Lesson 1.3 Multi-Digit Multiplication** and get the proper assistance needed during your homework.

## Spectrum Math Grade 6 Chapter 1 Lesson 1.3 Multi-Digit Multiplication Answers Key

Multiply 3,263 by 3.

Multiply 3,263 by 40.

Add.

**Multiply.
**Question 1.

a.

Answer:

Explanation:

324 × 27 = ??

=> 324 × 27 = 8,748.

Multiplied 324 by 27, we get 8,748 as the product.

b.

Answer:

Explanation:

816 × 16 = ??

=> 816 × 16 = 13,056.

Multiplied 816 by 16, we get 13,056 as the product.

c.

Answer:

Explanation:

255 × 44 = ??

=> 255 × 44 = 11,220.

Multiplied 255 by 44, we get 11,220 as the product.

d.

Answer:

Explanation:

2165 × 23 = ??

=> 2165 × 23 = 49,795.

Multiplied 2165 by 23, we get 49,795 as the product.

Question 2.

a.

Answer:

Explanation:

5,150 × 22 = ??

=> 5,150 × 22 = 1,13,300 .

Multiplied 5150 by 22, we get 1,13,300 as the product.

b.

Answer:

Explanation:

7182 × 12 = ??

=> 7182 × 12 = 86,184.

Multiplied 7182 by 12, we get 86,184 as the product.

c.

Answer:

Explanation:

6324 × 36 = ??

=> 6324 × 36 = 2,27,664.

Multiplied 6324 by 36, we get 2,27,664 as the product.

d.

Answer:

Explanation:

4,522 × 63 = ??

=> 4,522 × 63 = 2,84,886.

Multiplied 4522 by 63, we get 2,84,886 as the product.

Question 3.

a.

Answer:

Explanation:

886 × 374 = ??

=> 886 × 374 = 3,31,364.

Multiplied 886 by 374, we get 3,31,364 as the product.

b.

Answer:

Explanation:

763 × 618 = ??

=> 763 × 618 = 4,71,534.

Multiplied 763 by 618, we get 4,71,534 as the product.

c.

Answer:

Explanation:

654 × 523 = ??

=> 654 × 523 = 3,42,042.

Multiplied 654 by 523, we get 3,42,042 as the product.

d.

Answer:

Explanation:

985 × 447 = ??

=> 985 × 447 = 4,40,295.

Multiplied 985 by 447, we get 4,40,295 as the product.

Question 4.

a.

Answer:

Explanation:

2,186 × 342 = ??

=> 2,186 × 342 = 7,47,612.

Multiplied 2186 by 342, we get 7,47,612 as the product.

b.

Answer:

Explanation:

1,898 × 475 = ??

=> 1,898 × 475 = 9,01,550.

Multiplied 1898 by 475, we get 9,01,550 as the product.

c.

Answer:

Explanation:

3,688 × 259 = ??

=> 3,688 × 259 = 9,55,192

Multiplied 3688 by 259, we get 9,55,192 as the product.

d.

Answer:

Explanation:

2864 × 723 = ??

=> 2864 × 723 = 20,70,672.

Multiplied 2864 by 723, we get 20,70,672 as the product.