Practice with the help of **Spectrum Math Grade 5 Answer Key Chapter 1 Lesson 1.2 Multiplying 4 Digits by 1 and 2 Digits** regularly and improve your accuracy in solving questions.

## Spectrum Math Grade 5 Chapter 1 Lesson 1.2 Multiplying 4 Digits by 1 and 2 Digits Answers Key

Multiply from right to left.

**Multiply.**

Question 1.

a.

Answer:

Multiplication of right to left

Multiplication of 5 with 3 equal to 15.

Multiplication of 5 with 6 equal to 30.

Multiplication of 5 with 7 equal to 35.

Multiplication of 5 with 2 equal to 10.

b.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 7 with 4 equal to 28.

Multiplication of 7 with 0 equal to 0.

Multiplication of 7 with 2 equal to 14.

Multiplication of 7 with 6 equal to 42.

c.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 4 with 1 equal 4.

Multiplication of 4 with 2 equal to 8.

Multiplication of 4 with 2 equal to 8.

Multiplication of 4 with 3 equal to 12.

d.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 8 with 4 equal to 32.

Multiplication of 8 with 3 equal to 24.

Multiplication of 8 with 6 equal to 48.

Multiplication of 8 with 8 equal to 64.

e.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 6 with 3 we get 18.

Multiplication of 6 with 5 equal to 30

Multiplication of 6 with 2 equal to 12.

Multiplication of 6 with 7 equal to 42.

Question 2.

a.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 4 with 8 equal to 32.

Multiplication of 4 with 2 we get 8.

Multiplication of 4 with 7 we get 28.

Multiplication of 4 with 4 we get 16.

b.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 9 with 2 we get 18.

Multiplication of 9 with 6 we get 54.

Multiplication of 9 with 9 we get 81.

Multiplication of 9 with 3 we get 27.

c.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 2 with 4 equal to 8.

Multiplication of 2 with 5 equal to 10.

Multiplication of 2 with 8 equal to 16.

Multiplication of 2 with 1 equal to 2.

d.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 6 with 3 = 18.

Multiplication of 6 with 7 equal to 42.

Multiplication of 6 with 2 equal to 12.

Multiplication of 6 with 5 equal to 30.

e.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 3 with 6 equal to 18.

Multiplication of 3 with 5 equal to 15.

Multiplication of 3 with 4 equal to 12.

Multiplication of 3 with 4 equal to 12.

Question 3.

a.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 3 with 6 equal to 18.

Multiplication of 3 with 2 equal to 6.

Multiplication of 3 with 5 equal to 15.

Multiplication of 3 with 7 equal to 21.

b.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 2 with 8 equal to 16.

Multiplication of 2 with 2 equal to 4.

Multiplication of 2 with 4 equal to 8.

Multiplication of 2 with 9 equal to 18.

c.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

Multiplication of 8 with 5 equal to 40.

Multiplication of 8 with 2 equal to 16.

Multiplication of 8 with 3 equal to 24.

Multiplication of 8 with 7 equal to 58.

d.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

6414 x 7 = 49898.

If 6414 x 3 = 19242 then 6414 x 30 = 192420.

e.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

2889 x 1 = 2889.

If 2889 x 4 = 11556 then 2889 x 40 = 115560

Question 4.

a.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

5297 x 4 = 21188.

If 5297 x 6 = 31782 x 60 = 317820.

b.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

4175 x 3 = 12525

If 4175 x 2 = 8350 then 4175 x 20 = 83500.

c.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

8052 x 6 = 48312.

8052 x 4 = 32208 then 8052 x 40 = 322080.

d.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

2988 x 5 = 14950.

If 2988 x 8 = 23904 then 2988 x 80 = 239040.

e.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

6364 x 2 = 12728.

If 6364 x 9 = 57276 then 6364 x 90 = 572760.

Question 5.

a.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

3562 x 7 = 24934.

If 3562 x 2 = 13124 then 3562 x 20 = 131240.

b.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

7451 x 4 = 29804.

If 7541 x 5 x 37255 then 7541 x 50 = 37255.

c.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

1920 x 3 = 5760.

If 1920 x 8 = 15360 then 1920 x 80 = 153600.

d.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

9163 x 2 = 18326.

If 9163 x 7 = 64141 then 641410.

e.

Answer:

Multiply right to left.

4276 x 6 = 25656.

If 4276 x 5 = 239456 then 4276 x 50 = 213800.